Financial history Emmaus Hertfordshire

Charity number: 1073808
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £956.45k £881.98k £919.41k £1.14m £1.21m
Total expenditure £973.92k £934.18k £1.02m £1.09m £1.25m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £143.03k £129.23k £31.66k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £78.91k £41.68k £67.52k £204.41k £196.31k
Income - Other trading activities £594.06k £462.34k £864 £0 £697.09k
Income - Charitable activities £274.74k £241.64k £806.13k £915.81k £280.88k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.14k £901 £7.17k £2.77k £5.26k
Income - Other £7.61k £135.42k £38.59k £12.37k £29.23k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £944.94k £933.85k £1.02m £1.09m £1.25m
Expenditure - Raising funds £28.98k £322 £864 £325 £3.96k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £10.05k £10.63k £10.25k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0