Trustees BROCKENHURST GROUP RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1074217

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUSAN LYNES | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Susan Mary Hayes | Trustee | 08 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kirsty Dawn Bladen | Trustee | 08 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Coe | Trustee | 05 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Ann Davie | Trustee | 26 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
JANETTE LORRAINE SMETHURST | Trustee | 19 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD PHILIP WATERMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.