Financial history SOUTH RIVERSIDE COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT CENTRE LTD

Charity number: 1080314
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £433.31k £602.16k £452.38k £758.04k £508.87k
Total expenditure £390.38k £460.00k £509.92k £428.21k £449.62k
Income from government contracts £52.00k £30.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £52.00k £64.64k £67.35k £366.68k £316.51k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £0 N/A £659.72k £348.84k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 N/A £97.81k £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £543.87k N/A £0 £158.59k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £0 N/A £514 £1.44k
Income - Other N/A £58.29k N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £460.00k N/A £428.21k £449.62k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A £26.70k N/A £0 £11.89k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A £0 £0