ABACUS COUNSELLING SERVICES LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Abacus is an independent counselling organisation providing individual and personal confidential support. Abacus's experienced counsellors are trained in many aspects of counselling and are able to facilitate a wide range of counselling services to meet the needs of the local community. Counsellors at Abacus work with people on an individual basis, in a private and confidential setting.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Coventry City
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 28 July 1999: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sam Morris | Chair | 21 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Gerard Millsopp | Trustee | 21 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
MARY MORRIS | Trustee | 21 March 2025 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.19k | £65.14k | £32.92k | £19.67k | £14.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.20k | £64.45k | £32.55k | £19.97k | £14.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 March 2025 | 56 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 31 DECEMBER 1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 7 JULY 1999
Charitable objects
A) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO EMOTIONAL, PHYSICAL AND SEXUAL RELATIONSHIPS AND WITH A VIEW TO DEVELOPING PERSONAL RESPONSIBILITIES AND ENRICHING PERSONAL AND FAMILY LIFE B) TO SAFEGUARD AND PROTECT THE GOOD HEALTH, BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL OF ADULTS AND CHILDREN AND TO RELIEVE POVERTY, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS CAUSED BY THE BREAK-UP OF FAMILY AND PERSONAL RELATIONSHIPS
Area of benefit
WEST MIDLANDS AND WARWICKSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
2B Lansdowne Road
LEAMINGTON SPA
Warwickshire
Warwickshire
Warwickshire
CV32 4SS
- Phone:
- 02476226623
- Email:
- info@abacus-cs.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window