ETAL GROUP RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Horse riding for mentally and physicaly disabled in a controlled enviroment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Northumberland
Governance
- 19 February 1999: Standard registration
- RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION ETAL GROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pauline Jane Hall | Chair | 14 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Christine Harding | Trustee | 20 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Ready | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Phipps | Trustee | 29 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Helen Newlands | Trustee | 26 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
JOYCE STEVENS | Trustee | 26 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
MRS SUE WADE | Trustee | 26 May 2011 |
|
|||||
Sheila Elizabeth Mary Roddam | Trustee | 27 January 2004 |
|
|
||||
MRS DIANA SLEE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.81k | £243 | £320 | £928 | £4.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.46k | £1.08k | £1.07k | £2.79k | £5.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 March 2024 | 41 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7 DECEMBER 1998
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE OBJECTS OF THE RIDING FOR THE DISABLED ASSOCIATION INCORPORATING CARRIAGE DRIVING A CHARITY REGISTERED UNDER CHARITY NUMBER 244108 ("THE ASSOCIATION") BY PROVIDING DISABLED PEOPLE WITH THE OPPORTUNITY TO RIDE AND/OR TO CARRIAGE DRIVE TO BENEFIT THEIR HEALTH AND WELL BEING IN THE NORTHUMBERLAND AREA
Area of benefit
NORTHUMBERLAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
Castle Hills House
BERWICK-UPON-TWEED
TD15 1PB
- Phone:
- 01289 388254
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window