Financial history BARNSLEY CENTRAL DIVISION OF THE GUIDE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1074580
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £102.20k £101 £211 £472 £1.20k
Total expenditure £66.66k £8.12k £8.94k £6.56k £6.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £3.33k N/A N/A N/A N/A