Financial history CAMBRIDGE COUNCIL FOR VOLUNTARY SERVICE

Charity number: 1074947
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £178.13k £207.08k £262.75k £329.13k £452.46k
Total expenditure £184.65k £174.88k £220.88k £272.28k £409.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £118.07k £147.18k £155.94k £179.56k £267.01k