Accounts and annual returns VOICE (SUPPORTING EDUCATION & LEARNING)

Charity number: 1077833
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 21 March 2025 49 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 21 March 2025 415 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 13 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 13 January 2023 347 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 06 May 2021 95 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required