Financial history St. Paul's Steiner School

Charity number: 1076454
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £1.61m £1.65m £1.72m £1.94m £2.15m
Total expenditure £1.56m £1.61m £1.65m £1.84m £1.99m
Income from government contracts N/A £12.60k N/A N/A £17.02k
Income from government grants £56.10k £44.47k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £56.60k £50.90k £12.63k £22.25k £24.70k
Income - Other trading activities £13.02k £5.75k £12.17k £26.98k £21.81k
Income - Charitable activities £1.54m £1.59m £1.70m £1.89m £2.09m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.18k £285 £336 £4.75k £11.46k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.56m £1.61m £1.64m £1.82m £1.98m
Expenditure - Raising funds £2.38k £1.77k £8.29k £16.66k £9.71k
Expenditure - Governance £9.62k £8.00k £6.34k £6.43k £7.39k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0