Financial history BRADFORD TALKING MAGAZINES LTD

Charity Number: 1077122
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £299.20k £431.66k £379.90k £411.28k £334.43k
Total expenditure £276.53k £392.76k £343.21k £393.94k £491.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £73.89k
Income from government grants £81.20k £93.08k £101.58k £146.00k N/A