Accounts and annual returns THE FRIENDS OF PLATT FIELDS

Charity Number: 1086533
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 16 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 28 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 09 April 2023 160 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 21 March 2022 141 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required