Financial history THE NIDDERDALE AGRICULTURAL SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity number: 1080890
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023 30/11/2024
Total gross income £47.60k £54.88k £234.71k £194.69k £222.13k
Total expenditure £70.22k £45.93k £171.22k £190.13k £203.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A