Financial history SAVE A CHILD'S HEART

Charity number: 1077939
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £257.84k £205.11k £493.80k £204.24k £155.31k
Total expenditure £321.67k £197.77k £474.32k £153.32k £191.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A