Financial history STARVIEW CHARITY

Charity number: 1078321
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £173.04k £143.34k £209.64k £222.39k £176.92k
Total expenditure £98.01k £93.09k £172.55k £102.10k £166.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A