Financial history FALMOUTH ROTARY CLUB ENDOWMENT FUND

Charity Number: 1081111
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £441 £3.76k £3 £59 £260
Total expenditure £2.43k £251 £2.00k £0 £66
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A