BARROW CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROVIDE THE ADVICE PEOPLE NEED FOR THE PROBLEMS THEY FACE AND TO IMPROVE THE POLICIES AND PRACTISES THAT AFFECT PEOPLES' LIVES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £254,126 from 4 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cumbria
Governance
- 15 September 1999: Standard registration
- Citizens Advice Barrow (Working name)
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lynne Christine Chambers | Chair | 20 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Calvert | Trustee | 25 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lois Kate Postlethwaite | Trustee | 25 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Frederick Anthony Chatfield | Trustee | 19 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Louise Knagg | Trustee | 20 January 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £359.31k | £459.69k | £342.62k | £397.30k | £433.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £374.27k | £400.63k | £370.67k | £391.56k | £345.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £134.54k | £31.91k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £273.91k | £156.34k | £158.50k | £218.67k | £254.13k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06/05/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/01/2013
Charitable objects
FOR THE PROMOTION OF ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN BARROW AND DISTRICT BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION,THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
BARROW AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
RAMSDEN HALL
ABBEY ROAD
BARROW IN FURNESS
LA14 5QW
- Phone:
- 01229830367
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window