Financial history M & E CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1077657
Charity reporting is up to date (109 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £200.90k £69.62k £212.45k £161.36k £239.10k
Total expenditure £220.47k £68.31k £180.47k £205.68k £251.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A