Financial history Sight Support Worthing

Charity number: 1078504
Charity reporting is up to date (13 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £121.91k £114.09k £352.43k £207.38k £224.40k
Total expenditure £219.26k £200.86k £274.57k £418.57k £505.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £676 £1.27k N/A N/A