Financial history SEED MADAGASCAR

Charity number: 1079121
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £749.22k £631.74k £1.03m £1.01m £1.16m
Total expenditure £717.60k £741.10k £927.35k £960.67k £1.15m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £748.21k £621.64k £1.03m £1.00m £1.14m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.01k £99 £24 £4.43k £16.91k
Income - Other £0 £10.00k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £5.00k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £658.66k £689.42k £892.87k £934.57k £1.13m
Expenditure - Raising funds £12.22k £10.22k £13.67k £18.20k £16.54k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £71.62k £66.56k £88.01k £101.48k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £46.72k £41.46k £20.81k £7.91k £0