Financial history NORTH WEALD AIRFIELD MUSEUM ASSOCIATION ( NWAMA )

Charity number: 1081157
Charity reporting is overdue by 1468 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2012 30/06/2013 30/06/2014 30/06/2016 30/06/2017
Total gross income £7.17k £5.48k £10.43k £6.47k £6.75k
Total expenditure £6.69k £7.87k £8.16k £6.22k £10.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A