THE CHESTER CLERGY FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relief of need, hardship & distress, and promotion of education, family life and recreation among the families of clergy & licensed lay workers of the Church of England in the Diocese of Chester.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Halton
- Stockport
- Tameside
- Trafford
- Warrington
- Wirral
Governance
- 01 March 2000: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Philip Mason | Trustee | 11 October 2021 |
|
|||||||||||||
Julie Helen Withers | Trustee | 11 October 2021 |
|
|||||||||||||
Rt Revd Julie Anne Conalty | Trustee | 11 October 2021 |
|
|||||||||||||
Rev Samuel Jon Clint Corley | Trustee | 11 October 2021 |
|
|||||||||||||
Ruth Hazel Williams | Trustee | 11 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Sarah Denise Holmes | Trustee | 11 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Rev Georgina Jane Ann Watmore | Trustee | 26 January 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||
THE RT REVD DR MARK SIMON AUSTIN TANNER | Trustee | 15 July 2020 |
|
|||||||||||||
MRS SANDY VERITY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.02k | £34.57k | £29.63k | £30.92k | £65.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £47.15k | £40.54k | £24.61k | £27.98k | £6.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 01 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 01 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 05 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 05 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 03 August 2022 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 03 August 2022 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 26 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 26 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 04 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 04 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 12 OCTOBER 1999 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 15 JANUARY 2010 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 04 MAR 2019
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF OF NEED HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS AMONG THE FAMILIES OF CLERGY, ORDINANDS, AND OF LICENSED LAY WORKERS OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND FOR THE TIME BEING SERVING IN THE DIOCESE OF CHESTER. 2. THE PROMOTION OF THE EDUCATION OF THE FAMILIES OF CLERGY, ORDINANDS, AND OF LICENSED LAY WORKERS OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND FOR THE TIME BEING SERVING IN THE DIOCESE OF CHESTER AND WHO ARE IN FINANCIAL NEED. 3. THE PROMOTION OF THE FAMILY LIFE AND RECREATION OF THE CLERGY, ORDINANDS, AND OF LICENSED LAY WORKERS OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND FOR THE TIME BEING SERVING IN THE DIOCESE OF CHESTER AND THEIR FAMILIES AND WHO ARE IN FINANCIAL NEED.
Area of benefit
DIOCESE OF CHESTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Chester Clergy Family Charitable Trust
Bishops House
1 Abbey Street
CHESTER
CH1 2JD
- Phone:
- 01244350864
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window