FORD PARK CEMETERY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust is engaged in performing full interments, scattering of cremated remains and interment of cremated remains. In addition it is involved in educational activities relating to the History of the City and families to the community, conservation and the environment. Restoration of monuments/graves, landscaping and restoration of the cemetery generally is also of the highest priority.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £31,670 from 1 government contract(s) and £10,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Plymouth City
Governance
- 21 January 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rodney Mace Pickles | Trustee | 11 December 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Ian Robert Hodgins | Trustee | 07 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||
John Michael West | Trustee | 07 January 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Robin Leslie Tatam | Trustee | 07 January 2023 |
|
|||||||
Robert John Rex Martin | Trustee | 04 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Warwick Martin Lightfoot | Trustee | 04 November 2022 |
|
|
||||||
David Hugh Coles | Trustee | 04 November 2022 |
|
|||||||
Lindsay NOAD | Trustee | 15 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Margaret Frances Heath | Trustee | 07 September 2016 |
|
|||||||
JEAN CHRISTINE NORTHEY | Trustee |
|
||||||||
JOHN HUBERT CLAMP | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £205.21k | £205.21k | £235.23k | £202.78k | £202.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £226.69k | £226.69k | £246.35k | £246.07k | £241.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £31.67k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £47.98k | £10.00k | £10.00k | £10.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13 DECEMBER 1999 AS AMENDED 22 JUNE 2003
Charitable objects
1) THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF FORD PARK CEMETERY PLYMOUTH IN THE COUNTY OF DEVON AS A PUBLIC BURIAL PLACE 2) THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF FORD PARK CEMETERY AND ITS NATURAL ENVIRONMENT AS AN OPEN SPACE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC 3) THE RESTORATION AND PRESERVATION OF FORD PARK CEMETERY AS A SITE OF HISTORIC AND ARCHITECTURAL INTEREST FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT 4) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC PARTICULARLY IN THE HISTORY AND HERITAGE OF THE CITY OF PLYMOUTH 5) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS SHALL BE APPROVED BY THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS OF ENGLAND AND WALES
Area of benefit
FORD PARK CEMETERY PLYMOUTH IN THE COUNTY OF DEVON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ford Park Cemetery
Ford Park Road
Plymouth
Devon
- Phone:
- 01752665442
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window