Trustees MELLOR ARCHAEOLOGICAL TRUST
Charity number: 1081602

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BOB HUMPHREY-TAYLOR | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Kieran Gleave | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Adam Thompson FSA | Trustee | 23 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Judy Cooper | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
JUDITH LANHAM | Trustee | 21 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL VICTORIA SEWART | Trustee | 17 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
FRANK GALVIN | Trustee | 17 September 2012 |
|
|||||
PAULA BERNICE WHITTAKER | Trustee | 17 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
JOHN PETER HODGSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STAN BANNISTER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.