Governing document THE NATIONAL ASSOCIATION OF DISABLED SUPPORTERS
Charity number: 1079740
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28/08/1999 AS AMENDED ON 17/02/2000 AS AMENDED ON 15/04/2004 AS AMENDED ON 27/09/2004 AS AMENDED ON 24/06/2008 AS AMENDED ON 16/05/2013 AS AMENDED ON 19/05/2015
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF DISABLED PEOPLE BY PROMOTING IMPROVED ACCESS TO AND IMPROVED FACILITIES FOR THEM AS SPORTS SPECTATORS.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.