ST. PANCRAS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main activities of the Charity are the management of a multi-purpose Community Centre in the Camden Central area of London Borough of Camden. From the Centre we provide a range of services to people of all ages, directly and in partnership with others. Our aims are to improve the quality of life of people living locally through the provision of responsive services and activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £164,694 from 4 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Camden
Governance
- 01 December 1999: Standard registration
- 09 August 2023: Funds received from 1151369 TAI JI CIRCLE
- ST MARTINS COMMUNITY CENTRE (Working name)
- ST PANCRAS COMMUNITY CENTRE (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOSHUA JOHN ARNOLD | Trustee | 27 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Javed Azam | Trustee | 15 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Georgia Eracleous | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Elizabeth Jobling | Trustee | 10 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Aceil Haddad | Trustee | 10 January 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £411.84k | £322.52k | £378.78k | £404.83k | £408.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £352.31k | £335.31k | £374.99k | £391.25k | £364.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £202.37k | £203.69k | £178.50k | £183.21k | £164.69k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 08 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 09 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 12 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 29TH OCTOBER 1999
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA KNOWN AS ST PANCRAS IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF CAMDEN AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHIN ONE HALF MILE DISTANCE IN ANY DIRECTION OF ANY POINT ON ST PANCRAS WAY ( HEREINAFTER CALLED THE AREA OF BENEFIT) WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS 2) TO ESTABLISH, MAINTAIN AND MANAGE A COMMUNITY CENTRE OR CENTRES AND TO CO-OPERATE WITH ANY LOCAL STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE OR CENTRES FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY AND ITS CONSTITUENT BODIES IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
67 Plender Street
LONDON
NW1 0LB
- Phone:
- 02073801501
- Email:
- info@spca.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window