SHEFFIELD ALCOHOL SUPPORT SERVICE LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SASS provided information, advice, recovery & residential rehabilitation for people with alcohol and drug problems, their families & carers. SASS provides a crisis intervention and support service for families with problems around substance misuse and/or parenting. The charity is no longer active.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Derbyshire
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 28 June 2001: Standard registration
- 29 May 2019: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 29 May 2019: Funds transferred to 1173006 AIREDALE VOLUNTARY DRUG AND ALCOHOL AGENCY LIMITED
- SAAS (Working name)
- SHEFFIELD ALCHOL ADVISORY SERVICE (Previous name)
- SHEFFIELD ALCOHOL ADVISORY SERVICE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 30/09/2017 | 30/09/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £856.13k | £693.20k | £855.67k | £1.30m | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £880.59k | £784.74k | £843.56k | £1.41m | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £247.32k | £247.32k | £168.95k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | £370.98k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £13.60k | £32.33k | £23.65k | £37.31k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £833.59k | £655.75k | £822.52k | £1.25m | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £670 | £218 | £0 | £4 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £8.27k | £4.90k | £9.50k | £16.89k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £862.86k | £747.85k | £802.34k | £1.30m | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £41.22k | £84.13k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £7.60k | £6.90k | £0 | £11.49k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £22.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2018 | 18 May 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2017 | 09 August 2018 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2017 | 09 August 2018 | 10 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 16 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 16 January 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 18 November 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 18 November 2015 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 02/11/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22/11/2000 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 02/12/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15/11/2007 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 17/11/2011
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE IDENTIFICATION AND PREVENTION OF DIFFICULTIES ASSOCIATED WITH ALCOHOL CONSUMPTION AND SUBSTANCE MISUSE AND TO RELIEVE AND ASSIST THOSE SUFFERING THEREFROM AND THEIR FAMILIES, FRIENDS AND CARERS, SO LONG AS THOSE OBJECTS ARE SPECIFICALLY CHARITABLE. TO PROMOTE GOOD PARENTING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, INFORMATION, COUNSELLING AND SUPPORT TO ENABLE CHILDREN OR YOUNG PEOPLE TO REMAIN SAFELY WITHIN THE FAMILY HOME WHEREVER POSSIBLE. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ALL ASPECTS OF THE RELIEF AND PREVENTION OF DIFFICULTIES ASSOCIATED WITH ALCOHOL, OTHER SUBSTANCE MISUSE AND PARENTING.
Area of benefit
THE CITY OF SHEFFIELD AND DISTRICTS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window