CITIZENS ADVICE DAVENTRY AND DISTRICT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of advice & information on a broad range of subjects to the general public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Total income includes £121,223 from 3 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
16 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 21 December 1999: Standard registration
- DAVENTRY AND DISTRICT CAB (Working name)
- ADVICE DAVENTRY (Previous name)
- DAVENTRY AND DISTRICT CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU (Previous name)
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN EDWIN DONOVAN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Rosie Humphreys | Trustee | 27 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Virginia Hayden | Trustee | 21 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Peter Nigel Matten | Trustee | 24 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
GLORIA EDWARDS-DAVIDSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IAN CLARKE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CLIVE ALAN BROWN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STEPHEN HUPFIELD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £135.53k | £156.80k | £238.20k | £264.96k | £241.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £145.64k | £163.70k | £225.71k | £245.75k | £237.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £68.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £17.79k | £111.10k | N/A | £139.36k | £121.22k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 456 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 456 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15/11/1999 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 03/02/2009 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 02/08/2011 as amended on 07 Sep 2016
Charitable objects
THE BUREAU IS ESTABLISHED FOR THE PROMOTION OF ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE AREA OF DAVENTRY DISTRICT COUNCIL AND ADJACENT AREAS BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
THE AREA OF DAVENTRY DISTRICT COUNCIL AND ADJACENT AREAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Daventry & District Citizens Advice
Bureau
The Abbey
Market Square
DAVENTRY
NN11 4XG
- Phone:
- 01327701644
- Email:
- enquiries@cadd.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window