Financial history THE WENTWORTH CHARITY

Charity number: 1078792
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £33.57k £33.57k £27.52k £281.38k £516.52k
Total expenditure £18.31k £18.33k £36.96k £54.48k £83.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £516.52k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £73.60k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £10.18k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £7.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £50.00k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £10.18k
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0