PENMAEN AND NICHOLASTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide services for the benefit of the inhabitants of the villages and parishes of Penmaen and Nicholaston
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- City Of Swansea
Governance
- 20 July 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dale Edward Ponting | Chair | 30 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
claire Cotter | Trustee | 06 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Brian Martin | Trustee | 06 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Annzella Jane Gregg | Trustee | 06 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Diane Williams | Trustee | 06 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Cody Bates | Trustee | 06 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jacquelyn Ponting | Trustee | 30 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
DR Sophie Kett-White | Trustee | 31 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE PATTON | Trustee | 29 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE HILL | Trustee | 29 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
JERRY KINGHAM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER BURGESS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.43k | £1.15k | £3.96k | £8.38k | £8.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.66k | £1.69k | £3.08k | £6.19k | £9.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 June 2024 | 217 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 10 JUNE 1999
Charitable objects
THE PROPERTY HEREBY DEMISED TOGETHER WITH SUCH OTHER PROPERTY AS MAY BE ACQUIRED BY THE TRUSTEES (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE TRUST PROPERTY") SHALL BE HELD UPON TRUST FOR THE PURPOSES OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISHES OF PENMAEN AND NICHOLASTON IN THE COUNTY OF SWANSEA WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES AND OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF THE LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
THE PARISHES OF PENMAEN AND NICHOLASTON IN THE COUNTY OF SWANSEA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HAZELCOURT
NICHOLASTON
PENMAEN
SWANSEA
SA3 2HL
- Phone:
- 01792371305
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window