Financial history YORKSHIRE DALES RAILWAY MUSEUM TRUST (HOLDINGS) LIMITED

Charity number: 1116386
Charity reporting is up to date (116 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £688.38k £607.81k £1.17m £1.60m £3.09m
Total expenditure £687.69k £552.05k £1.08m £1.55m £2.88m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £36.00k £20.95k £4.00k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £16.32k £36.65k £52.90k £261.77k £190.45k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £154.63k £269.25k
Income - Charitable activities £655.22k £410.19k £909.70k £1.18m £2.62m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £5.11k £4.61k £4.26k £519 £4.67k
Income - Other £11.73k £156.37k £204.35k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £653.48k £533.29k £1.06m £1.37m £2.01m
Expenditure - Raising funds £34.21k £18.76k £17.19k £182.82k £291.93k
Expenditure - Governance £223.92k £247.89k £353.07k £34.00k £52.98k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £578.35k