Financial history R.D.M. PARAKKANVILAI FUND

Charity number: 1080653
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £6.12k £11.55k £9.48k £3.31k £4.55k
Total expenditure £5.01k £13.95k £3.87k £2.74k £8.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A