Financial history C P SPORT

Charity number: 1088600
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £360.48k £388.70k £299.77k £314.98k £261.54k
Total expenditure £384.21k £364.09k £287.75k £289.61k £261.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A