Financial history VOLUNTARY AND COMMUNITY ACTION TRAFFORD LTD

Charity number: 1098222
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £88.08k £82.16k £52.53k £28.55k £19.34k
Total expenditure £79.78k £64.63k £47.06k £36.65k £19.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £12.22k £2.29k N/A N/A