Trustees SHEFFIELD OCCUPATIONAL HEALTH ADVISORY SERVICE
Charity number: 1085464

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ibthesam Mohsin Obaid | Trustee | 26 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dilan Ekong Tsafack | Trustee | 26 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Haksathul Nazreen Sainudeen Marikkar Mohamed Shakeek | Trustee | 12 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Fahiim Osman | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Francis Creed | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Steve Hambleton | Trustee | 09 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
ADRIAN PATRICK BOYCE BUDGEN | Trustee |
|
||||||
ANNE MARGARET GILLER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.