Financial history THE LOWE SYNDROME TRUST

Charity Number: 1081241
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £43.15k £57.58k £18.57k £3.86k £38.10k
Total expenditure £75.56k £56.72k £69.55k £67.15k £28.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A