Financial history KIPUNGANI SCHOOL TRUST

Charity number: 1080588
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £18.79k £54.85k £36.04k £15.52k £46.31k
Total expenditure £45.05k £34.38k £34.39k £22.58k £31.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A