Catherine Beckett Community Centre

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide facilities in the interests of social welfare for recreation and leisure time occupation with the object of improving lifestyles for the said inhabitants. To establish and secure a community centre and to maintain and manage the same. To support and promote the needs of the local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £350 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lancashire
Governance
- 15 November 2000: Standard registration
- GREATER DEEPDALE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Bilal Mohamed Bham | Chair | 05 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mohammed Sohail Patel | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Thackeray | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Kenny | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sabbir Selant | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ahmed James | Trustee | 05 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Staples | Trustee | 24 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
MARK WILLIAM ANDREW ROBERTS | Trustee | 15 November 2000 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £53.75k | £71.39k | £41.49k | £35.02k | £31.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £65.53k | £47.00k | £60.54k | £52.00k | £45.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £24.74k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £24.74k | £59.60k | £21.33k | £350 | £350 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 12 OCTOBER 2000 as amended on 13 Feb 2024
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. B) TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME
Area of benefit
GREATER DEEPDALE DEFINED BY BLACKPOOL ROAD, NORTH ROAD, RINGWAY AND NEW HALL LANE IN THE BOROUGH OF PRESTON, LANCASHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
CATHERINE BECKETT COMMUNITY CENTRE
DEEPDALE ROAD
PRESTON
PR1 5AR
- Phone:
- 07807936161
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window