Financial history GAP-A THANET COMMUNITY PROJECT

Charity number: 1084622
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £162.87k £87.35k £155.96k £168.50k £197.24k
Total expenditure £154.18k £108.59k £142.75k £158.07k £178.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £10.65k N/A
Income from government grants £5.00k £27.74k £6.49k £10.65k £2.60k