Financial history TESTON LAND CONSERVATION TRUST

Charity number: 1082554
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £3.30k £14.21k £3.06k £3.60k £2.97k
Total expenditure £674 £3.01k £1.87k £1.19k £474
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A