Financial history KINGS CROSS - BRUNSWICK NEIGHBOURHOOD ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1083901
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £547.04k £791.37k £376.92k £479.15k £660.09k
Total expenditure £565.87k £520.51k £535.53k £467.86k £634.61k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £113.36k £190.19k N/A
Income from government grants £120.52k £225.92k £21.94k N/A £135.50k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.00k £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities £545.53k £748.08k N/A N/A £651.14k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 N/A N/A £0
Income - Other £516 £43.29k N/A N/A £8.95k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £565.87k £520.51k N/A N/A £615.78k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance £20.34k £19.94k N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 N/A N/A £18.83k