Financial history AFRICAN CARIBBEAN COMMUNITY INITIATIVE (A.C.C.I.)

Charity number: 1081996
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £925.91k £1.21m £1.42m £1.25m £1.48m
Total expenditure £885.55k £1.07m £1.18m £1.29m £1.49m
Income from government contracts £770.38k £945.39k £1.13m £991.73k £1.14m
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.72k £5.07k £40.75k £32.37k £28.20k
Income - Other trading activities £5.56k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £918.22k £1.21m £1.38m £1.22m £1.44m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £415 £62 £19 £1.68k £4.86k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £1.00k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £885.55k £1.07m £1.18m £1.29m £1.49m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £9.93k £10.29k £11.02k £11.72k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0