Financial history BASINGSTOKE MENCAP SERVICES

Charity Number: 1085576
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £171.54k £178.84k £175.83k £216.96k £199.32k
Total expenditure £177.84k £137.53k £197.79k £195.85k £233.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £15.72k £77.32k £13.53k £10.23k £26.71k