BASINGSTOKE MENCAP SERVICES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Basingstoke Mencap works for the relief of people with learning disabilities in particular by the provision of help and support for them and their families, dependents and carers. The society also provides or assists in the provision of facilities for recreation or other leisure time occupation for people who have a learning disability.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £26,706 from 8 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
32 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hampshire
Governance
- BASINGSTOKE MENCAP (Working name)
- BASINGSTOKE AND DISTRICT SOCIETY FOR MENTALLY HANDICAPPED CHILDREN AND ADULTS (Previous name)
- BASINGSTOKE MENCAP SERVICES (Previous name)
- BASINGSTOKE MENCAP SUPPORT WORKER SCHEME (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cheryl Claire Edwards | Chair | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
JACQUELINE MAIREAD COLUMBUS HEAD TUSTAIN | Trustee | 21 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Diogo Goncalo Epifanio Clemente Cardoso Da Silva | Trustee | 23 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Hallowes Bushell | Trustee | 22 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Polly Ann Buckland | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN PRITCHARD | Trustee | 21 June 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £171.54k | £178.84k | £175.83k | £216.96k | £199.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £177.84k | £137.53k | £197.79k | £195.85k | £233.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £15.72k | £77.32k | £13.53k | £10.23k | £26.71k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 February 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 01 February 2024 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29/12/2000 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 03/09/2013
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF PEOPLE WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES AND THEIR CARERS IN THE LOCAL GOVERNMENT DISTRICT AND IN THE SURROUNDING AREAS OF THE BOROUGH OF BASINGSTOKE AND DEANE (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") PARTICULAR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS. B) TO PROMOTE AND ORGANISE CO-OPERATION IN THE ACHIEVEMENT OF THE ABOVE PURPOSES AND TO THAT END TO BRING TOGETHER REPRESENTATIVES OF THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS ENGAGED THE FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE PURPOSES WITHIN THE LOCAL GOVERNMENT DISTRICT AND BOROUGH OF BASINGSTOKE AND DEANE. PROVIDED THAT, IN CARING OUT THESE CHARITABLE PURPOSES, THE CHARITY WILL SEEK TO CHALLENGE ALL FORMS OF OPPRESSION AND INEQUALITY AND GIVE PRIORITY TO WORKING WITH PEOPLE WHOSE FULL PARTICIPATION IN SOCIETY IS LIMITED BY ECONOMIC AND SOCIAL DISADVANTAGE. C) TO BE SO CONSTITUTED AND ADMINISTERED THAT IT IS AT NO TIME (FOR THE PURPOSES OF THE LOCAL GOVERNMENT AND HOUSING ACT 1989) UNDER THE CONTROL OR SUBJECT TO THE INFLUENCE OF A LOCAL AUTHORITY.
Area of benefit
IN THE LOCAL GOVERNMENT DISTRICT AND IN THE SURROUNDING AREAS OF THE BOROUGH OF BASINGSTOKE .AND DEANE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Basingstoke Mencap Services
The Orchard
White Hart Lane
Basingstoke
Hants
RG21 4AF
- Phone:
- 01256423886
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window