Trustees THE FOOD ETHICS COUNCIL

Charity number: 1101885
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ralph Early Chair 10 October 2018
PRAISE BEE
Received: On time
Elta Smith Trustee 17 January 2024
None on record
Albert Tucker Trustee 04 May 2022
None on record
Dr Julian Baggini Trustee 14 October 2021
BRITISH PHILOSOPHICAL ASSOCIATION
Recently registered
Chloe Donovan Trustee 21 April 2020
None on record
Dr Nigel Dower Trustee 08 October 2019
None on record
PATRICIA WHALEY Trustee 23 January 2017
None on record