WELLAND AND DISTRICT PRE SCHOOL GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Rural Pre-School catering for children aged between 2yrs and 5 years. Open Monday to Friday, during term time, from 8:30AM to 3PM.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2022
Total income includes £76,330 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 22 November 2000: Standard registration
- WELLAND & DISTRICT PRE SCHOOL GROUP (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alison Martin | Trustee | 12 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Debbie Dyke | Trustee | 12 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Chloe Morgan | Trustee | 20 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
ANDREA CALVESBERT | Trustee | 20 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Holly Hall | Trustee | 29 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lois Bolton | Trustee | 09 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Holding | Trustee | 09 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Lederer | Trustee | 10 November 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £103.95k | £108.65k | £117.06k | £102.55k | £97.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £86.36k | £102.88k | £99.52k | £92.88k | £101.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £80.54k | £84.76k | £92.24k | £83.62k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £76.33k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 325 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 325 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 09 April 2025 | 649 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 691 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 25 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 25 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 20 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 20 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 MARCH 2000 as amended on 15 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND BY: (A) OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY FACILITIES AND TRAINING COURSES, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN REGARDLESS OF RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION OR MEANS (B) ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS IN THE LOCAL AREAS (C) INSTIGATING AND ADHERING TO AND FURTHERING THE AIM OF THE PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE WELLAND & DISTRICT PRE SCHOOL GROUP
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE PAVILION
SPITALFIELD
MARLBANK ROAD
WELLAND
MALVERN
WR13 6NE
- Phone:
- 01684311807
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window