Financial history THE MAGDI YACOUB INSTITUTE

Charity number: 1082750
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.18m £1.11m £2.24m £889.83k £1.11m
Total expenditure £1.37m £1.23m £1.43m £1.58m £1.56m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £119.71k £55.87k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.18m £1.10m £2.23m £884.67k £1.10m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.58k £376 £109 £5.15k £13.69k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £747.27k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.22m £1.07m £1.25m £1.29m £1.25m
Expenditure - Raising funds £147.50k £162.41k £180.92k £286.84k £313.75k
Expenditure - Governance £80.70k £89.83k £98.28k £152.50k £168.23k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0