Financial history KING'S CLIFFE HERITAGE

Charity number: 1082444
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £3.65k £3.13k £2.83k £15.42k £4.34k
Total expenditure £2.91k £5.85k £2.45k £6.01k £366
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A