Trustees TCC (TREFNU CYMUNEDOL CYMRU/TOGETHER CREATING COMMUNITIES)
Charity number: 1086434

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Janet Thomas | Trustee | 09 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Hall | Trustee | 09 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Byrne | Trustee | 08 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hugo Panayiotou | Trustee | 08 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Rose Cooper | Trustee | 08 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Darren Hampton | Trustee | 07 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Melissa Griffiths | Trustee | 07 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Lavery | Trustee | 10 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Donat Burke | Trustee | 23 December 2021 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.