THE FRIENDS OF SWINDON SHOPMOBILITY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Day Trips Social Events Disabilty equipment purchases
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Swindon
Governance
- 09 October 2000: Standard registration
- 08 February 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 08 February 2021: Funds transferred to 287732 VOLUNTARY ACTION - SWINDON
- FOSM (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £453 | £1.71k | £50 | £201 | £1.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £224 | £0 | £115 | £80 | £3.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 30 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 05 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 13 November 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 MAY 2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 4 SEPTEMBER 2000 AND 31 AUGUST 2006.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE DISABLED, ELDERLY AND INFIRM PEOPLE IN THE SWINDON AREA IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE PROVISION OF AN ESCORT AND EQUIPMENT DELIVERY AND COLLECTION SERVICE FOR THE MEMBERS AND USERS OF SWINDON SHOPMOBILITY, AND THROUGH THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT AND FACILITIES FOR THE USE OF PEOPLE WITH MOBILITY DIFFICULTIES.
Area of benefit
THE SWINDON AREA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window