Financial history LONDON SCHOOL OF OSTEOPATHY

Charity number: 1085391
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £1.01m £1.11m £1.21m £1.35m £1.33m
Total expenditure £988.95k £1.03m £1.11m £1.11m £1.11m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £85.46k £14.39k £469 £860.72k £809.41k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £25.87k £22.91k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £997.75k £1.10m £1.21m £1.31m £1.28m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £348 £20 £1.07k £11.77k £24.81k
Income - Other £15.80k £14.39k £469 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £25.87k £22.91k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £988.95k £1.03m £1.11m £1.11m £1.11m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £5.65k £5.50k £4.89k £5.88k £5.90k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0